MULTI-DISCIPLINARY INTERNATIONAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: THEORY AND APPLICATIONS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
MISTA is a non-profit making organisation which organises international, academic conferences, focussing on the applications and theory of scheduling. The conference is held every two years. Any Profits that are acquired will be used for the benefit of future conferences.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 11 Rhagfyr 2023: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 313713 OPERATIONAL RESEARCH SOCIETY LIMITED
- 15 Gorffennaf 2015: Cofrestrwyd
- 11 Rhagfyr 2023: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- MISTA (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £6.59k | £11.23k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £7.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 26 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 28 Mawrth 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 28 Mawrth 2022 | 148 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 28 Mawrth 2022 | 513 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 DEC 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF RESEARCHERS, PRACTITIONERS AND VENDORS SPECIALISING IN MULTI-DISCPLINARY SCHEDULING BY PROVIDING CONFERENCES AND OTHER TRAINING IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST THE SCIENTIFIC COMMUNITY) ON THE SUBJECT OF MULTI-DISCIPLINARY SCHEDULING AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH SCIENTIFIC RESULTS AND OTHER SCIENTIFIC MATERIAL THAT WOULD BE OF BENEFIT TO THE PUBLIC.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window