REALISE ACADEMY PARTNERSHIP TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Trust supports member academies to achieve their individual goals by: ? Developing and sharing best practice in teaching, learning and curriculum ? Creating a skilled, motivated, expert workforce through coordination of professional training, coaching, career development and recruitment. ? Working collaboratively to increase operational efficiency and make optimum use of available resources.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 January 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 24 Awst 2015: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Ebrill 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- RAPT (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £9.95k | £2.73k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2018 | 24 Medi 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2017 | 12 Hydref 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/08/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: 3.1.1 PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR SUCH PURPOSES INCLUDING BY PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING MODELS OF GOOD PRACTICE AND BY THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SERVICES GENERALLY TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS; AND 3.1.2 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO WORK OR VOLUNTEER IN, OR GOVERN, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS TO DELIVER A HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION TO THE PUPILS AND COMMUNITIES SERVED BY THOSE INSTITUTIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window