Dogfen lywodraethu BREAKTHROUGH FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 DEC 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/06/2015 as amended on 15 Jun 2020 as amended on 18 Jul 2022 as amended on 23 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND LEARNING IN RESEARCH OF USEFUL SUBJECTS OF STUDY BY: • GRANTING AWARDS FOR UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND • RECOGNISING OUTSTANDING ACHIEVEMENTS IN RESEARCH TO ACT AS AN INCENTIVE TO OTHERS. 2. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ISRAEL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.