Dogfen lywodraethu YOUNG GAMERS AND GAMBLERS EDUCATION TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/06/2015 as amended on 04 Oct 2019 as amended on 26 Mar 2019 as amended on 23 Mar 2021 as amended on 13 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The advancement of mental and physical health and wellbeing through the provision of training, education, resources, and strategic partnerships to support the interests of children, young people, and other vulnerable groups, preventing harms related to gaming, gambling and online behaviours through education and earlier intervention; and The advancement of science through research and understanding of matters relating to gaming, gambling and online behaviours amongst children, young people and other vulnerable groups, with a focus on the prevention of harms.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.