Dogfen lywodraethu PHAB FREEWHEELERS PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND ABLE BODIED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1976 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 1977, 6 APRIL 1978, 17 APRIL 1980, 16 MAY 1985, 4 MAY 1995 AND 23 JULY 1998 as amended on 19 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE PERMANENTLY DISABLED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW VIS OR HERAFTER MAY BE DEEMED NBY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF STAFFORDSHIRE. (B) TO PROVIDE REGULAR GATHERINGS OF SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITES BETWEEN THE MEMBERS. (C) TO PROMOTE FULL PARTICIPATION, INTERGRATION, RECREATIONAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES AND FRIENDSHIPS BETWEEN THE PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND ABLE BODIED. (D) TO OBTAIN AN AND ACCEPT FUNDS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AD EXPENDMONIES RECEIVED FROM ANY SOURCE.
Maes buddion
WITHIN THE AREA OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.