Dogfen lywodraethu MALVERN FESTIVAL CHORUS
Rhif yr elusen: 506787

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES SEPTEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 1977 AND 10 MARCH 1987, 13 JULY 1999 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 08 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION A ND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC IN MALVERN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY INSTRUCTION IN THE RELEVANT SKILLS AND THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER RELEVANT ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.