INSPIRE SCHOOLS TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We serve schools and churches in communicating Christian based teaching through assemblies, workshops, holiday clubs and special one off programmes. Children are encouraged to explore views on certain topics and to appreciate those of others, linking in with the British Values, SEAL etc. We deliver training in the UK and provide resources to equip others including a range of children?s books
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 01 January 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 19 Ionawr 2016: Cofrestrwyd
- 27 Ebrill 2023: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 01/01/2018 | 01/01/2019 | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £9.86k | £7.10k | £6.92k | £1.24k | £1.01k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £9.20k | £7.36k | £7.59k | £1.02k | £1.11k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ionawr 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ionawr 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ionawr 2022 | 17 Gorffennaf 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ionawr 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ionawr 2021 | 27 Medi 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ionawr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ionawr 2020 | 20 Hydref 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ionawr 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 AUG 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE ("THE OBJECTS"): (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SUBJECT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION (WITHOUT RESTRICTION TO ANY PARTICULAR RELIGION); AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH DOCTRINES OUTLINED IN THE APOSTLE'S CREED - THAT IS BELIEF IN/OF/THAT: 1. GOD, THE FATHER ALMIGHTY, CREATOR OF HEAVEN AND EARTH. 2. JESUS CHRIST, HIS ONLY SON, OUR LORD. 3. JESUS CHRIST WAS CONCEIVED BY THE POWER OF THE HOLY SPIRIT AND BORN OF THE VIRGIN MARY. 4. JESUS CHRIST SUFFERED UNDER PONTIUS PILATE, WAS CRUCIFIED, DIED, AND WAS BURIED. 5. JESUS CHRIST DESCENDED TO THE DEAD. ON THE THIRD DAY HE ROSE AGAIN. 6. JESUS CHRIST ASCENDED INTO HEAVEN AND IS SEATED AT THE RIGHT HAND OF THE FATHER. 7. JESUS CHRIST WILL COME AGAIN TO JUDGE THE LIVING AND THE DEAD. 8. THE HOLY SPIRIT, 9. THE HOLY CATHOLIC CHURCH, THE COMMUNION OF SAINTS, 10. THE FORGIVENESS OF SINS, 11. THE RESURRECTION OF THE BODY, 12. LIFE EVERLASTING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window