Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF HAYFIELD SCHOOL
Rhif yr elusen: 507215

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 NOVEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 1982, 27 SEPTEMBER 2005, 11 JULY 2008 AND 14 OCTOBER 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY - 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.