Dogfen lywodraethu PRAYERHOUSE OF DELIVERANCE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 DEC 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAY 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 JUN 2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND OPERATING AN INTERNET RADIO, TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.