THE WIGGIN FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
General charitable purpose
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Anifeiliaid
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 03 Awst 2016: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PETER WIGGIN | Cadeirydd | 20 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Kiki Louisa Wiggin | Ymddiriedolwr | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN EMMA WIGGIN | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PETER WIGGIN | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ROBERT WIGGIN | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 December 2015 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £17.01k | £11.94k | £11.10k | £13.85k | £23.39k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 11 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 18 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 24 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 14 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 15 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22 JUL 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND MEDICAL RESEARCH (A) THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UK; AND (B) TO PROMOTE MEDICAL RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT EITHER DIRECTLY BY MAKING RESEARCH GRANTS OR INDIRECTLY BY MAKING DONATIONS TO OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES UNDERTAKING APPROPRIATE PROJECTS AND WHO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. 3.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND (B) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES - IN THE UK AND ABROAD - THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. 3.3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE. 3.4 THE CARE OF ANIMALS (A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE MEDICAL VETERINARY RESEARCH INTO ANIMAL ILLNESSES AND DISEASES; (B) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL-USAGE; AND (C) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. 3.5 THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY UK PRIMARY OR SECONDARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL; (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY. (I) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (II) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (C) TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES. (D) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE LEARNING BY PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING IN SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE. 3.6 THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN (A) THE RELIEF OF NEED, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THOSE SERVING IN OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE UK'S ARMED FORCES. (B) TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE UK'S ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS THROUGH:- (I) WELFARE ADVICE AND SUPPORT; AND (II) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (C) TO SUPPORT REGIMENTAL MUSEUMS WHICH ARE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC AND OTHER TRUST FUNDS WHICH UPHOLD THE TRADITIONS OF MILITARY REGIMENTS AND OTHER UNITS THROUGH PERPETUATING THEIR DEEDS, PURCHASING UNIFORMS, MEDALS, PICTURES,BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, MAPS, DOCUMENTS AND OTHER ARTICLES WHICH ARE, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, IN THE SPIRIT AND INTENT OF THE CHARITY. (D) TO SUPPORT OTHER CHARITIES PROVIDING CHARITABLE SERVICES TO SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE UK'S ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION AND THE SOLDIERS, SAILORS, AIRMEN AND FAMILIES ASSOCIATION - FORCES HELP, HELP FOR HEROES AND INDIVIDUAL REGIMENTAL AND OTHER MILITARY CHARITIES. 3.7 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE MAKING OF DONATIONS TO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE TRUST OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Parsonage Farm
Bentworth
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 5RB
- Ffôn:
- 01420 562175
- E-bost:
- wigginhome@aol.com
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window