KST FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We are still in the planning stage of the KST Foundation.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Caint
Llywodraethu
- KENT SPORTS TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 21 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 21 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 25 Hydref 2019 | 267 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 25 Hydref 2019 | 267 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Jul 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION [FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KENT AND THE SURROUNDING COUNTIES] BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR PARTICIPATING IN SPORTS; AND 2. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN KENT AND THE SURROUNDING COUNTIES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window