WATERFALLS CHURCH

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The principal purpose of the CIO is to advance the Christian faith in the United Kingdom and other parts of the world for the benefit of the the public. The CIO may advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and /or other parts of the world. The activities may include but not restricted to: Regular Public Worship Prayer Bible study Preaching Baptism
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2022
Pobl

3 Ymddiriedolwyr
4 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Dinas Llundain
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
Llywodraethu
- 01 Ebrill 2016: CIO registration
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EUNICE JUBIN | Cadeirydd | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIET OFORI-DADZIE | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ATTA-SAOW | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £23.13k | £26.73k | £36.37k | £34.27k | £76.97k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £19.69k | £24.31k | £19.69k | £29.15k | £55.08k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2023 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 296 diwrnod | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2023 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 296 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2022 | 12 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2022 | 13 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2021 | 09 Gorffennaf 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2021 | 10 Gorffennaf 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2020 | 10 Gorffennaf 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2020 | 10 Gorffennaf 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2019 | 01 Awst 2020 | 2 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2019 | 01 Awst 2020 | 2 diwrnod yn hwyr | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Apr 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNITED KINGDOM AND OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE CIO MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. IN FULFILLING ITS PURPOSE THE CIO WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS THAT WILL VARY FROM TIME TO TIME WITH ACTIVITIES BEING INITIATED, EXPANDED, OR CLOSED, AS APPROPRIATE. THE ACTIVITIES MAY INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT RESTRICTED TO: • REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP,PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING AND TEACHING; • BAPTISM, AS DESCRIBED IN THE HOLY BIBLE; • THE COMMUNION OF THE LORD’S SUPPER WHICH SHALL NORMALLY BE OBSERVED AT LEAST ONCE A MONTH; • EVANGELISM AND MISSION, LOCALLY, REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY; • THE TEACHING,ENCOURAGEMENT, WELCOME AND INCLUSION OF YOUNG PEOPLE; • NURTURE AND GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES; • EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CHRISTIAN AND COMMUNITY SERVICE; • GIVING AND ENCOURAGING PASTORAL CARE; • SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING CHARITABLE SOCIAL ACTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD; • ENCOURAGING RELATIONSHIPS WITH AND SUPPORTING OTHER CHRISTIANS; • PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SPIRITUAL, PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT. WE AFFIRM THE HOLY BIBLE AS THE INSPIRED WORD OF GOD, AND AS THE ONLY BASIS FOR OUR BELIEFS. THE CIO ACCEPTS THE BAPTIST UNION’S DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLE: , AS OUR BASIC CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND GENERAL STATEMENT OF OUR FAITH: “THAT OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST, GOD MANIFEST IN THE FLESH, IS THE SOLE AND ABSOLUTE AUTHORITY IN ALL MATTERS PERTAINING TO FAITH AND PRACTICE, AS REVEALED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, AND THAT EACH CHURCH HAS LIBERTY, UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, TO INTERPRET AND ADMINISTER HIS LAWS. THAT CHRISTIAN BAPTISM IS THE IMMERSION IN WATER INTO THE NAME OF THE FATHER, THE SON AND HOLY SPIRIT, OF THOSE WHO HAVE PROFESSED REPENTANCE TOWARDS GOD AND FAITH IN OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST WHO ‘DIED FOR OUR SINS ACCORDING TO THE SCRIPTURES; WAS BURIED, AND ROSE AGAIN ON THE THIRD DAY’. THAT IT IS THE DUTY OF EVERY DISCIPLE TO BEAR PERSONAL WITNESS TO THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST, AND TO TAKE PART IN THE EVANGELISATION OF THE WORLD.” THIS CIO IS AUTONOMOUS AND MAINTAINS THE RIGHT TO GOVERN ITS OWN AFFAIRS, INDEPENDENT OF ANY DENOMINATIONAL CONTROL. HOWEVER, RECOGNISING THE BENEFITS OF COOPERATION WITH OTHER CHURCHES IN WORLD MISSIONS, THE CIO IS IN FELLOWSHIP WITH CHURCHES OF VARIOUS DENOMINATIONS INCLUDING MEMBERS OF THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN (BAPTIST UNION) AND WILL PURSUE SUCH RELATIONSHIPS NECESSARY TO FURTHER ITS MISSION. THE CIO WILL NORMALLY PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE WORK OF THE BAPTIST UNION THROUGH PRAYER, FINANCIAL CONTRIBUTIONS AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, BY MAKING PERSONNEL AVAILABLE FROM THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE CHURCH. WHEN IT IS ABLE THE CIO WILL ALSO SUPPORT LOCAL BAPTIST AND ECUMENICAL GATHERINGS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
3RD FLOOR
207 REGENT STREET
LONDON
W1B 3HH
- Ffôn:
- 02030868966
- E-bost:
- info@waterfallschurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window