THE ROGER GOWER MEMORIAL FUND
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Born to Fly looks to support conservation strategies in Kenya and Tanzania through helping key stakeholders gain access to and the trust of communities through helping with education initiatives.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 January 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anifeiliaid
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Cenia
- Tanzania
Llywodraethu
- 07 Mai 2024: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1186533 TUSK TRUST LIMITED
- 19 Ebrill 2016: CIO registration
- 07 Mai 2024: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £90.36k | £20.93k | £2.79k | £872 | £753 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £131.28k | £1.59k | £2.16k | £104.49k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2023 | 17 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2023 | 17 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2022 | 07 Tachwedd 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2022 | 07 Tachwedd 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2021 | 29 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2021 | 29 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2020 | 25 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2020 | 25 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Apr 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS WILDLIFE IN AFRICA BY PROVIDING PROTECTION FROM POACHING, APPROPRIATE CARE, TREATMENT AND SECURITY IN THE FACE OF POACHING; (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE WORLD AT LARGE, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF AFRICAN WILDLIFE AFFECTED BY POACHING AND IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AS A RESULT OF POACHING; (C) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF AFRICAN WILDLIFE AFFECTED BY POACHING, SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT AND POOR CIRCUMSTANCES; (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN COMBATING WILDLIFE POACHING IN AFRICA, MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY AFRICAN WILDLIFE AFFECTED BY POACHING; AND (E) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window