Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF THE LINCOLN MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 11 APRIL 1972 AS AMENDED 2 MAY 1984, 4 MAY 1999, 3 MAY 2000 AND 26 APRIL 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER THE PUBLIC EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OF THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY BY PROMOTING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROMOTION OF IMPROVEMENTS IN THE ORGANISATION OF, AND THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY AND GENERALLY IN THE QUALITY OF THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY BY THE PUBLIC AND BY MEANS OF LECTURES, MEETINGS, DISCUSSIONS AND VISITS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THOSE SUBJECTS WHICH ARE OF CONCERN TO THE MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.