IMPACT TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Our primary focus is on the promotion of resilience and sustainable development. Accordingly, our programmatic and partnership efforts seek to promote basic literacy, environmental literacy, health literacy, political literacy, shareholder literacy, civic literacy and professional / workplace literacy.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
4 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Cymru A Lloegr
- De Affrica
Llywodraethu
- 10 Mai 2016: Cofrestrwyd
- THE IMPACT TRUST (Enw gwaith)
- THE SEED IMPACT TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau ymgyrchoedd a gweithgaredd gwleidyddol
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Cynnwys siaradwyr allanol mewn digwyddiadau elusennol polisi a gweithdrefnau
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY HAROLD NOTCUTT | Cadeirydd | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Walter CLaus Heinrich Wehrmeyer | Ymddiriedolwr | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Patrick McInerney | Ymddiriedolwr | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Bellamy | Ymddiriedolwr | 30 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Gerard Mario Salole | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Benedict Peile | Ymddiriedolwr | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £125.00k | £195.93k | £177.00k | £90.13k | £123.87k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £116.49k | £149.57k | £157.00k | £135.95k | £162.43k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 22 Awst 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 22 Awst 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 20 Ebrill 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 20 Ebrill 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 05 Awst 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 05 Awst 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 10 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 10 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 18 Ebrill 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 18 Ebrill 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 06 JAN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: 1. PROMOTING COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING IN RESPECT OF COMMUNITIES WHICH ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PROMOTING THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING: (A) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY, SKILLS AND SELF-RELIANCE OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY MEMBERS SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (B) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO COMMUNITY MEMBERS IN FINDING AND SECURING EMPLOYMENT; (C) PROVIDING CAPITAL GRANTS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO LAND AND/OR BUILDINGS AT BELOW MARKET OR SUBSIDISED RATES TO ASSIST IN THE START UP OF COMMUNITY BASED ENTERPRISES AND COOPERATIVES WITH A VIEW TO INCREASING EMPLOYMENT, SELF-SUFFICIENCY AND SUSTAINABLE LIVELIHOODS IN POOR, UNDER RESOURCED AND UNDER EDUCATED COMMUNITIES. 2. THE PROMOTION OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR, IN SOUTH AFRICAÆS TOWNSHIPS) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUTH AND UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE. (D) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO PROVIDE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE THROUGH INTERNSHIPS, WORK PLACEMENT OR OTHER SHORT AND/OR LONG-TERM OPPORTUNITIES. (E) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP (I) IN DEVELOPING THE SKILLS THEY NEED TO SECURE EMPLOYMENT AND/OR ESTABLISH THEIR OWN BUSINESS; (II) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT WITHIN EXISTING BUSINESSES. (F) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS. (G) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING: O SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3. PREVENTING OR RELIEVING POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES AND/OR INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL EDUCATION, SKILLS TRAINING, FOOD SECURITY, NUTRITION AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 4. PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT MOST ESPECIALLY IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND DEGRADATION; INCLUDING: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL CITIZENSHIP. IN THESE OBJECTS SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS." 5. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION, DIVERSITY AND EQUALITY THROUGH UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND THE WAYS IN WHICH IT CAN BE OVERCOME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING THROUGH EDUCATION AND AWARENESS CAMPAIGNS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATION OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
30 KINGS LANE
WINDLESHAM
GU20 6JQ
- Ffôn:
- 07444382270
- E-bost:
- tamzin@impacttrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window