Dogfen lywodraethu JAIN SAMAJ EUROPE
Rhif yr elusen: 507899

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (67 diwrnod yn hwyr)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JULY 1978 AMENDED 15 JUNE 1980, 14 FEBRUARY 1982, 21 AUGUST 1983, 17 AUGUST 2008 AND 26 SEPTEMBER 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JAIN RELIGION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OR WORSHIP AND STUDY AND FACILITIES FOR OTHER FUNCTIONS OF A RELIGIOUS CHARACTER SUCH AS THE CELEBRATION OF BIRTHS AND MARRIAGES AND THE PERFORMANCE OF RITES RELATING TO DEATHS AND THE EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING OF A PRIEST.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.