KELLYDELI FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The KellyDeli Foundation aim is to advance and promote worldwide: 1) the relief of poverty or of those in need; 2) education, including the award of scholarships, maintenance allowances or grants or the provision of facilities for education in schools or other educational establishments; 3) health and wellbeing; 4) the protection of our environment;
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Colombia
- Ffrainc
- Gwlad Belg
- Gwlad Pwyl
- Madagasgar
- Norwy
- Portiwgal
- Sbaen
- Sweden
- Twrci
- Yr Almaen
- Yr Eidal
- Yr Iseldiroedd
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £313.10k | £18.42k | £3.34k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £116.64k | £74.47k | £5.91k | £101.97k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 13 Mawrth 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 13 Mawrth 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 13 Mawrth 2021 | 133 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 13 Mawrth 2021 | 133 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 24 Chwefror 2020 | 116 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 24 Chwefror 2020 | 116 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 20 Mawrth 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR |
31 Rhagfyr 2017
(Mae'r cyfrifon |
20 Mawrth 2018 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jul 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE "TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR, (WITHOUT LIMITATION), THE:- RELIEF OF POVERTY OR OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS OR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION IN SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS; ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES; AND ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window