RHINO CONSERVATION BOTSWANA (UK) TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The main objective of the charity is to promote the conservation, preservation and protection of species of wildlife which are in danger of extinction in the wild, particularly but not exclusively, rhinoceros. It aims to advance the education of the public in nature conservation and the protection of endangered animals. The charity operates in Botswana and liases with the Botswana government.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 28 February 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Anifeiliaid
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Botswana
Llywodraethu
- 03 Mehefin 2016: Cofrestrwyd
- 05 Medi 2022: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £177.96k | £52.82k | £36.55k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £76.64k | £42.20k | £70.44k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 29 Chwefror 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 29 Chwefror 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2019 | 16 Ionawr 2020 | 19 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2019 | 16 Ionawr 2020 | 19 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO: PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF SPECIES OF WILDLIFE WHICH ARE IN DANGER OF EXTINCTION IN THE WILD, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, RHINOCEROS; AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN NATURE CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF ENDANGERED ANIMALS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, RHINOCEROS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF SUCH SUBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window