THE HULL (NORTH BRANSHOLME) PHOENIX PROJECT
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The organisation has been set up as a CIO registered charity, whose objectives are to bring about community cohesion through working primarily with the residents of the North Bransholme Community and the surrounding wards. The work undertaken is without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 May 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dinas Kingston Upon Hull
Llywodraethu
- 22 Mehefin 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1174051 ILKLEY MANOR HOUSE TRUST
- 08 Gorffennaf 2016: CIO registration
- 22 Mehefin 2022: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
- THE HULL (NORTH BRANHOLME) PHOENIX PROJECT (Enw blaenorol)
- THE HULL (NORTH BRANSHOLME) PHOENIX PROJECT (Enw blaenorol)
- THE HULL(NORTH BRANSHOLME)PHOENIX PROJECT (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £39.68k | £29.86k | £58.37k | £56.30k | £55.53k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £43.29k | £29.33k | £41.33k | £53.84k | £72.65k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | £1.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2021 | 17 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2021 | 17 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2020 | 09 Mawrth 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2020 | 09 Mawrth 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2019 | 13 Chwefror 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2019 | 13 Chwefror 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 JUL 2016 AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NORTH BRANHOLMES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window