Dogfen lywodraethu WREXHAM'S HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE
Rhif yr elusen: 508725
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 1979 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 1980, 14 APRIL 1983, 11 APRIL 1985, 17 APRIL 1986, 25 APRIL 1991, 30 APRIL 1992 AND 17 JUNE 1993 AND 30 JUNE 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PATIENTS IN THE WREXHAM MAELOR HOSPITAL BY PROVIDING A BROADCASTING SERVICE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE DISTRICT OF WREXHAM MAELOR.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.