Dogfen lywodraethu TEESDALE AND WEARDALE SEARCH AND MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/09/1968 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/1978 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/1979 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/1988 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1991 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENTS OR NATURAL HAZARDS, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF TRAINED RESCUE TEAMS TO OPERATE THROUGHOUT COUNTY DURHAM OR AND ANY OTHER PLACE IF REQUESTED. 2) TO SEEK TO EDUCATE ALL POTENTIAL USERS OF THE HILLS AND COUNTRYSIDE, ADVISING OF POSSIBLE DANGERS IN THE AREA AND AIMING TO PREVENT TRAGEDIES OR MISHAPS BY GIVING TALKS AND DEMONSTRATIONS TO INTERESTED ORGANISATIONS.
Maes buddion
COUNTY DURHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.