WIGAN HERITAGE AND MINING MONUMENT
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The trustees announced that they were undertaking a fundraising exercise to raise upto £150k in order to fund the building of a mining monument to commemorate the many thousands of people who worked in or were affected by mining, and the crucial role which mining played in the development of the town. The design and construction of the statue has been contracted to artist Steve Winterburn.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Wigan
Llywodraethu
- 14 Mawrth 2023: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 513511 Lancashire Mining Museum Limited
- 24 Ionawr 2017: CIO registration
- 14 Mawrth 2023: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
- WHAMM (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £101.99k | £24.82k | £22.68k | £889 | £125 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £15.21k | £37.79k | £51.08k | £42.47k | £3.95k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 16 Ionawr 2023 | 77 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 16 Ionawr 2023 | 77 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 22 Medi 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 22 Medi 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 28 Awst 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 28 Awst 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE TOWN OF WIGAN IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WIGAN: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF MINING WIGAN AND ITS IMPACT ON THE TOWN AND ITS PEOPLE (2) TO PROMOTE THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE AREA BY THE CREATION, ERECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MONUMENT IN A PROMINENT TOWN CENTRE LOCATION TO COMMEMORATE THE MANY THOUSANDS OF PEOPLE WHO WORKED IN AND WERE AFFECTED BY MINING, AND THE CRUCIAL ROLE WHICH MINING PLAYED IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE TOWN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window