Dogfen lywodraethu STOCKDALES OF SALE, ALTRINCHAM AND DISTRICT LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 AUGUST 1980 AND 13 MARCH 2003 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2005 as amended on 31 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH, CARE, WELFARE, INTERESTS, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM VERY SEVERE LEARNING DISABILITIES AND COMPLEX MULTIPLE NEEDS AND TO PROVIDE RESPITE & PERMANENT RESIDENTIAL CARE TO THOSE PEOPLE WHERE APPROPRIATE.
Maes buddion
THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.