COMMUNITY HEALTH FIRST (CHF)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
the charity helps build capacity in the local community to tackle health related issues
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Brent
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £5.00k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 97 diwrnod | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 97 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 463 diwrnod | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 463 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 828 diwrnod | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 828 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 06 Ebrill 2022 | 65 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 06 Ebrill 2022 | 65 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 06 Ebrill 2022 | 430 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 06 Ebrill 2022 | 430 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A)RELIEF OF SICKNESS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS IN BRENT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, COMMUNITY SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS DEVOTED TO HEALTHCARE. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE RESOURCES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BRENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE TO THE PERMANENT AND TEMPORARY RESIDENTS IN THE HARLESDEN AND STONEBRIDGE WARDS OF BRENT BY. PROVIDING A DATABASE OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE LOCAL RESOURCES, E-BULLETINS; POSTERS; WORKSHOPS; NEWSLETTERS. RAISING AWARENESS OF LOCAL COMMUNITY HEALTH AND SOCILA CARE SERVICES AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ON HOW TO ACCESS LOCAL HEALTH AND COMMUNITY CARE SERVICES THAT CONTRIBUTE TO MEETING THE HEALTH AND SOCILA CARE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT B)COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BRENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE HARLESDEN AND STONEBRIDGE WARDS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY THE ADVANCEMENT OF STRONGER LINKS AND PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN THE COMMUNITIES AND THE VARIOUS HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS IN THOSE COMMUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFITS IN BRENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE PERMANENT AND TEMPORARY RESIDENTS OF HARLESDEN AND STONEBRIDGE WARDS BY PROVIDING NETWORK OPPORTUNITIES WITH AND BETWEEN, MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES; COMMUNITY GROUPS; AND ORGANISATIONS WITH THE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELYT ON ISSUES SUCH AS HEALTH; HOUSING; EMPLOYMENT; COLD HOMES; ISOLATION; LONELINESS; EDUCATIO; FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY RELATING TO PEOPLES OWN HEALTH. INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN COLLECTIVE EFFORT SO THEY GAIN THE CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN ABILITIES TO INFLUENCE DECISIONS IN RELATION TO HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RELATING TO PEOPLES OWN HEALTH PROVIDING A PARTNERSHIP COMMUNITY FORUM, COMMUNITY CONSULTATION EVENTS, COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRS, COMMUNITY E-BULLETINS, COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES, AND COMMUNITY HEALTH CHAMPIONS ENABLING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO DEVELOP AND CONTRIBUTE TO A GREATER IMPACT ON THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING AGENDA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY RELATING TO PEOPLES OWN HEALTH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window