Elusennau cysylltiedig SAMARITANS OF LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Rhif yr elusen: 1170691
Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
RULES ADOPTED 11/03/1965
AS AMENDED ON 21/03/1973
AS AMENDED ON 22/03/1984
AS AMENDED ON 26/03/1993
AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2004
AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2006
AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2015
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN LEICESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
LEICESTER AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Hanes cofrestru
- 31 Mai 1965 : Cofrestrwyd
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.