Elusennau cysylltiedig SAMARITANS BRIGHTON HOVE AND DISTRICT
Rhif yr elusen: 1170866

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH FEBRUARY AS AMENDED 26TH MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 2006
AS AMENDED ON 18 MAR 2015
AS AMENDED ON 16 FEB 2016
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BRIGHTON, HOVE AND DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
CENTRAL SOUTHERN SUSSEX
Hanes cofrestru
- 11 Awst 1971 : Cofrestrwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.