Dogfen lywodraethu THE PHOENIX PLAYERS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES DATED 19 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 29 JANUARY 1979 AND 8 OCTOBER 1979 as amended on 01 Nov 2022 as amended on 25 Apr 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2. ?THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY IS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS (TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE); AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: A. TO PROMOTE PLAYS, DRAMAS, COMEDIES, OPERAS, OPERETTAS AND OTHER DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL WORKS OF EDUCATIVE VALUE. B. TO PURCHASE ACQUIRE AND OBTAIN INTERESTS IN THE COPYRIGHT OF OR THE RIGHT TO PERFORM OR SHOW ANY SUCH DRAMATIC OR OPERATIC WORKS. C. TO PURCHASE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE PLANT, MACHINERY, FURNITURE, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, SCENERY AND ALL OTHER NECESSARY EFFECTS. D. TO RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTIONS, DONATION AND OTHERWISE, PROVIDED THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS. E. TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.