Elusennau cysylltiedig SAMARITANS OF BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM, ASCOT AND DISTRICTS
Rhif yr elusen: 1170901

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MARCH 1973 AND AMENDED 25 APRIL 1994 AND 3 MAY 2007.
AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2016
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM, ASCOT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS
TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
BRACKNELL, WOKINGHAM, ASCOT AND SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 24 Mai 1973 : Cofrestrwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.