FASHION REVOLUTION FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE, EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PERSONS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN OR CUSTOMERS OF THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAIN, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SUFFERING AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HUMAN RIGHTS
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 April 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Ariannin
- Aserbaijan
- Awstralia
- Awstria
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Bolifia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brasil
- Bwlgaria
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Cenia
- Chile
- Colombia
- Congo (Gweriniaeth Ddemocrataidd)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- De Affrica
- De Corea
- Denmarc
- Ecwador
- El Salvador
- Estonia
- Ethiopia
- Feneswela
- Ffrainc
- Fiet-nam
- Ghana
- Groeg
- Guatemala
- Gwlad Belg
- Gwlad Pwyl
- Gwlad Swazi
- Gwlad Thai
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Japan
- Kuwait
- Liberia
- Lithwania
- Lwcsembwrg
- Macedonia
- Malaysia
- Mecsico
- Moroco
- Nepal
- Nicaragwa
- Nigeria
- Norwy
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Paraguai
- Periw
- Philipinas
- Portiwgal
- Rwmania
- Sbaen
- Seland Newydd
- Serbia
- Singapore
- Slofacia
- Slofenia
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Trinidad A Tobago
- Tsieina
- Tunisia
- Twrci
- Ukrain
- Unol Daleithiau
- Vanuatu
- Wrwgwâi
- Y Ffindir
- Yr Aifft
- Yr Almaen
- Yr Eidal
- Yr Emiraethau Arabaidd Unedig
- Yr Iseldiroedd
- Y Swistir
- Y Weriniaeth Ddominicaidd
- Y Weriniaeth Tsiec
- Zimbabwe
Llywodraethu
- 08 Ebrill 2024: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1159356 THE LABOUR BEHIND THE LABEL TRUST
- 14 Mehefin 2017: Cofrestrwyd
- 08 Ebrill 2024: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £5.74k | £13.42k | £29.73k | £20.14k | £33.47k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £9.87k | £540 | £5.11k | £7.27k | £26.42k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2023 | 02 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2023 | 02 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2022 | 26 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2022 | 26 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2021 | 08 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2021 | 08 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2020 | 02 Rhagfyr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2020 | 02 Rhagfyr 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 20 NOV 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4. THE FOUNDATION’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH APPLICABLE LAWS AND REGULATIONS BY PERSONS AND BUSINESSES IN SUCH COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME WHO ARE INVOLVED IN OR WHO ARE CUSTOMERS OF THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAIN INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FARMERS, PRODUCERS, MANUFACTURERS, BUYERS, DESIGNERS, RETAILERS, SUPPLIERS, WORKERS IN ANY SUCH BUSINESSES, CUSTOMERS OF ANY SUCH BUSINESSES AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY; (B) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PERSONS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN OR CUSTOMERS OF THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAIN INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FARMERS, PRODUCERS, MANUFACTURERS, BUYERS, DESIGNERS, RETAILERS, SUPPLIERS, WORKERS IN ANY SUCH BUSINESSES, CUSTOMERS OF ANY SUCH BUSINESSES AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY CONCERNING SOUND EMPLOYMENT PRACTICES AND ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY THROUGHOUT THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAINS, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THROUGH ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF TEACHING, TRAINING, PUBLISHING, EXHIBITIONS, EVENTS, SEMINARS AND OTHER MEANS OF PROVIDING EDUCATION SERVICES AND RESOURCES; (C) THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN SUCH COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME THROUGH, AMONG OTHER THINGS, THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MAKING AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC REPORTS ON THE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT ACROSS THE FASHION, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, ACCESSORIES AND TEXTILES MANUFACTURING AND SUPPLY CHAINS AND THE PROMOTION OF THE PRACTICE OF RE-CYCLING AND RE-USE OF CLOTHING; (D) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SUFFERING IN SUCH COUNTRIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME; (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS BY INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS AND ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS; IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE DIRECTORS SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE DIRECTORS ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE FOUNDATION TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE FOUNDATION CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS; AND (3) ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window