NEWHAM NORTH LEARNING PARTNERSHIP
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Newham North has the 5th highest rate of child poverty in London and the lowest life expectancy and the highest rate of heart disease of all London Boroughs. The Newham North Learning Partnership is a small charity set up to try and tackle these problems at their root, by helping fund and support early intervention projects within the Community.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Newham
Llywodraethu
- 15 Chwefror 2017: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Gorffennaf 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £53.88k | £31.97k | £15.17k | £15.06k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £41.76k | £32.19k | £13.52k | £17.66k | £17.41k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2022 | 25 Gorffennaf 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2021 | 23 Mehefin 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2020 | 22 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2019 | 15 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2019 | 15 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 SEP 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S PURPOSES AS SET OUT IN THE OBJECTS CONTAINED IN THE COMPANYÆS MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION WOULD BE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN NEWHAM AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) PROMOTING CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP; (C) ADVANCING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; (D) PROMOTING RACIAL HARMONY; (E) PROMOTING AND PRESERVING GOOD HEALTH; (F) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (G) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT I.E. ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND BY (H) PROMOTING THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR YOUTH AND/OR BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIAL AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.Ö THE CHARITY WILL ACHIEVE THIS THROUGH THE RAISING AND ADMINISTERING OF FUNDS AND DELIVERING OF SUPPORT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE LOCAL ORGANISATIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window