Dogfen lywodraethu VALE TALKING NEWS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/1980 AS AMENDED ON 31/07/1980 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2012 as amended on 11 Apr 2022 as amended on 11 Apr 2022 as amended on 04 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES OR TACTILE READING MATTER. PLEASE SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.