Dogfen lywodraethu UK CERVICAL CANCER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 APR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK OR ELSEWHERE THROUGH ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) PROVIDING EDUCATION ABOUT THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CERVICAL CANCER AND OTHER WOMEN'S DISEASES AND CANCERS; B) PROMOTING SCREENING, TREATMENT AND VACCINATION FOR CANCER AND PARTICULARLY CERVICAL CANCER; C) FACILITATING MEDICAL SCREENING, VACCINATION AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CERVICAL AND SIMILAR CANCERS; D) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND RELIEF TO THOSE IN NEED WHO ARE AFFECTED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BY CERVICAL CANCER AND OTHER RELATED WOMEN'S DISEASES AND CANCERS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.