Dogfen lywodraethu ALLERDALE DISABILITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1989 7 NOVEMBER 1992, 26 OCTOBER 1996, 16 MAY 1998, 12 MAY 2001 AND 11 NOVEMBER 2003 as amended on 25 May 2018 as amended on 25 May 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DISABLED PEOPLE WITHIN ALLERDALE AND WEST COAST DISTRICT IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE AFOREGOING (1) TO CO-OPERATE WITH VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS IN ORDER TO CO-ORDINATE THEIR ACTIVITIES RELATING TO DISABLED PEOPLE (2) TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION RELATING TO DISABLED PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
ALLERDALE AND WEST COAST DISTRICT.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.