RICHARD TAYLOR'S EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
RTET merged with existing charities RTEF and BYC owning Richard Taylor CofE School and Bilton Youth Centre to support RTS and young people in Harrogate with educational grants and to provide young people, the elderly and the disadvantaged in Harrogate and beyond with recreational services for their health wellbeing intellectual and social benefit and grants to improve their spiritual health.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

8 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gogledd Swydd Gaerefrog
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
8 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Steven Paul Haslam | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY JANET HILDRED | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Sheena Mary Hodgeon | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alene Elizabeth Bloomfield | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robert Scott | Ymddiriedolwr | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Hodgeon | Ymddiriedolwr | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
KRISTIAN JAY RANDALL | Ymddiriedolwr | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wilson Helm | Ymddiriedolwr | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £19.36k | £18.96k | £24.37k | £45.48k | £69.93k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £26.79k | £35.35k | £14.33k | £28.65k | £117.19k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 26 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 26 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 13 Gorffennaf 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 13 Gorffennaf 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 04 Mai 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 04 Mai 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 26 Gorffennaf 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 26 Gorffennaf 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 15 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 15 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2017 as amended on 13 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. The objects of the CIO are specifically restricted to the following wholly charitable purposes only: 3.1 To advance education by applying such yearly income as the charity trustees see fit, being not more than one-quarter of the said net income, in providing such special benefits, of any kind not normally provided from central or local government funds for the school known as Richard Taylor Church of England Primary School (or its successor) (the “School”) as may from time to time be agreed upon by trustees and the governors of the School, provided that the Charity Commission may, on the application of the charity trustees, approve in any year a sum in excess of the said one-quarter. 3.2 To advance education by applying the net yearly income of the CIO in one or more of the following ways for the benefit of boys and girls resident in the Borough of Harrogate who, in the opinion of the charity trustees, are in need of financial assistance: – 3.2.1 Exhibitions or Grants tenable at any secondary school, training college for teachers, university, or other institution of further (including professional and technical) education, approved by the charity trustees, to be awarded under rules to be made by the charity trustees, including rules as to the value and period of tenure of the exhibitions, and the qualifications, and method of ascertainment and selection, of candidates; 3.2.2 Financial assistance, outfits, clothing, tools, instruments or books to help beneficiaries on leaving school, university or any other educational establishment, to prepare for, or to enter a profession, trade or calling; or 3.2.3 Otherwise promoting the education (including social and physical training) of beneficiaries; provided that in the allocation of such benefits, the charity trustees shall have regard to the promotion of education in the principles of the Church of England 3.3 For the for the public benefit, including for the benefit of the inhabitants of the borough of Harrogate:- 3.3.1 to promote the development of children and young people aged under 25 years in achieving their full physical, mental, social and spiritual capacities so that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved; and 3.3.2 provide, or assist in the provision of, facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation to such persons who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity, disability, poverty or social and economic circumstances or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Richard Taylor Primary School
Bilton Lane
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG1 3DT
- Ffôn:
- 01423 565129
- E-bost:
- clerk.rtef@gmail.com
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window