Dogfen lywodraethu LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 510687
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1962 AS AMENDED 29 MAR 1980, 25 MAR 1995, 8 APR 2002, 1 MAY 2004, 1 NOV 2004 AND 13 APR 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE THE HONEYBEE, BY PROMOTING THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC OF THE BENEFIT OF BEES TO THE ENVIRONMENT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.