Dogfen lywodraethu THE ARTS SOCIETY YORK
Rhif yr elusen: 510912

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS OF 10 JUNE 1980 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2006, ORDER OF 15 FEBRUARY 2007 AND RESOLUTION 24 APRIL 2007. AS AMENDED ON 15 JAN 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS; AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE PRESERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.