Women's Inclusive Team

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We offer activities to empower BAME women and girls through various initiatives. These are targeted towards disadvantaged women, youth and early years.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 01 April 2024
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £167,842 o 5 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Pobl

11 Ymddiriedolwyr
251 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 08 Mai 2018: Cofrestrwyd
- SOMALI INTEGRATION TEAM (Enw blaenorol)
- Ofsted (Swyddfa Safonau Mewn Addysg)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau ymgyrchoedd a gweithgaredd gwleidyddol
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Cynnwys siaradwyr allanol mewn digwyddiadau elusennol polisi a gweithdrefnau
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cyfryngau cymdeithasol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
11 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliane Guderian | Ymddiriedolwr | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Olga Petrovic | Ymddiriedolwr | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yemi Sonuga | Ymddiriedolwr | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Quyen Le | Ymddiriedolwr | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Safia MBE | Ymddiriedolwr | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emily Xiao-Fang Teh | Ymddiriedolwr | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richa Ellis | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zeinab Ali | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sabaad Hassan | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
SIEDA OMAR ISMAN | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amina Abdi | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £190.72k | £842.58k | £664.95k | £572.85k | £456.85k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £187.78k | £654.26k | £596.17k | £556.76k | £523.00k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £81.83k | £74.17k | £41.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £58.76k | £88.26k | £283.77k | £167.84k | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £842.58k | £664.95k | £572.85k | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £654.26k | £596.17k | £556.76k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | N/A | £0 | £0 | £1.08k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2024 | 24 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2024 | 24 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2023 | 31 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2023 | 31 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2022 | 31 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2022 | 31 Ionawr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2021 | 01 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2021 | 01 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2020 | 16 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2020 | 16 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 APR 2018 as amended on 19 Feb 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. ?)THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: 1)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG WOMEN AND CHILDREN FROM THE SOMALI COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SEX, RACE OR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; AND 2)TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS. II)IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE COMPANY SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: A)TO HELP WOMEN GAIN ACCESS TO INFORMATION, SERVICES AND TRAINING. B)TO CREATE LINKS WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SERVICES AND SUPPORT RELEVANT TO THE NEEDS OF LOCAL WOMEN AND TO PROVIDE INFORMATION TO WOMEN ON GAINING ACCESS TO THESE ORGANISATIONS. C)TO RUN SELF-HELP GROUPS, CONFIDENCE BUILDING ACTIVITIES AND BUILD NETWORKS AMONGST WOMEN. D)TO RUN ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE SOCIAL COHESION AND CROSS CULTURAL UNDERSTANDING. E)TO SUPPORT WOMEN IN BECOMING POSITIVE ROLE MODELS FOR THEIR CHILDREN AND TO INCREASE THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE PARENTAL ROLE. F)TO PROMOTE CLIENTS TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ORGANISATION AT ALL LEVELS. G)TO EMPLOY AND PAY ANY PERSON OR PERSONS (NOT BEING A DIRECTOR HEREOF) TO SUPERVISE ORGANISE AND CARRY ON THE WORK AUTHORISED BY THE DIRECTORS. H)TO RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF LOAN SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION, GRANT OR OTHERWISE PROVIDED THAT THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MEMBERS SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITIES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR THE SAID OBJECTS. I)TO ADVISE, SUPPORT, CO-OPERATE AND COLLABORATE WITH VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY AGENCIES AND AUTHORITIES OPERATING IN SIMILAR CHARITABLE FIELDS AND TO EXCHANGE INFORMATION AND ADVICE. J)TO ESTABLISH AND OPERATE BOTH CURRENT ACCOUNTS AND DEPOSIT ACCOUNTS WITH BANKERS IN THE NAME OF THE COMPANY PROVIDED THAT CHEQUES DRAWN ON SUCH ACCOUNTS SHALL NOT BE SIGNED BY LESS THAN TWO MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MEMBERS. K)TO PURCHASE TAKE ON LEASE OR IN EXCHANGE HIRE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE ANY PROPERTY AND ANY RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SAID OBJECTS AND TO CONSTRUCT MAINTAIN AND ALTER ANY BUILDINGS OR ERECTIONS SO NECESSARY AS AFORESAID. L)TO MAKE REGULATIONS FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF ANY PROPERTY WHICH MAY BE ACQUIRED. M)TO PUBLISH BOOKS, PAMPHLETS, REPORTS, LEAFLETS, JOURNALS, FILMS, TAPES AND INSTRUCTIONAL MATTER AND TO ORGANISE CONFERENCES , SEMINARS, LECTURES, BROADCASTS AND COURSES OF INSTRUCTIONS. N)TO RECEIVE DONATIONS, ENDOWMENTS, SUBSCRIPTIONS AND LEGACIES FROM PERSONS DESIRING TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS AFORESAID OR ANY OF THEM AND TO HOLD FUNDS IN TRUST FOR THE SAME. O)SUBJECT TO SUCH CONSENTS AS MAY BE REQUIRED BY LAW TO BORROW OR RAISE MONEY FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ON SUCH TERMS AND ON SUCH SECURITY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING MAKING REASONABLE CHARGES FOR ANY SERVICES PROVIDED HEREUNDER (WHETHER TO BENEFICIARIES OR NOT). P)TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT OR AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OR TO AMALGAMATE WITH ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS AND TO SUBSCRIBE LEND OR GUARANTEE MONEY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY WAY CONNECTED WITH THE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY OR CALCULATED TO FURTHER ITS OBJECTS. Q)TO UNDERTAKE AND EXECUTE ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS WHICH MAY LAWFULLY BE UNDERTAKEN BY THE COMPANY AND MAY BE NECESSARY TO ITS OBJECTS. R)TO INVEST THE MONIES OF THE COMPANY IN OR UPON SUCH INVESTMENTS, SECURITIES, OR PROPERTY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE FOR THE TIME BEING, SUBJECT NEVERTHELESS TO SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AND SUCH CONSENTS (IF ANY) AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE IMPOSED OR REQUIRED BY LAW AND SUBJECT ALSO AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED. S)TO ENGAGE OR EMPLOY SUCH PERSONNEL (WHETHER AS EMPLOYEES CONSULTANTS ADVISERS OR HOWEVER) AS MAY BE REQUISITE TO THE PROMOTION OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY AND ON SUCH TERMS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY THINK FIT. T)TO PROVIDE OR PROCURE THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND GUIDANCE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM. U)TO RECEIVE LOANS AT INTEREST OR OTHERWISE FROM AND TO LEND MONEY AND GIVE CREDIT TO, TO TAKE SECURITY FOR SUCH LOANS OR CREDIT AND TO GUARANTEE AND BECOME OR GIVE SECURITY FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF CONTRACTS BY ANY PERSON OR COMPANY AS MAY BE NECESSARY OR CONVENIENT FOR THE WORK OF THE COMPANY. V)TO DRAW ACCEPT ENDORSE ISSUE OR EXECUTE PROMISSORY NOTES, BILLS OF TRADING, WARRANTS AND OTHER NEGOTIABLE TRANSFERABLE OR MERCANTILE INSTRUMENTS FOR THE PURPOSE OF OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY. W)TO ESTABLISH PROMOTE OR ASSIST COMPANIES WITH CHARITABLE OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE COMPANY FOR THE ACQUISITION OF THE PROPERTY OR LIABILITIES OF THE COMPANY OR TO CARRY ON ANY AUTHORISED ACTIVITY OF THE COMPANY OR FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE CALCULATED TO BENEFIT THE COMPANY IN THE FURTHERANCE OF ITS OBJECTS. X)TO AMALGAMATE MERGE OR JOIN IN WITH ANY CHARITY HAVING CHARITABLE OBJECTS WHOLLY OR IN PART SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THIS COMPANY FOR THE PURPOSES OF BETTER EFFECTUATING THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES. Y)TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT PENSION SCHEMES FOR AND TO GRANT PENSIONS TO ANY EMPLOYEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS OF THE COMPANY CALCULATED TO BENEFIT SUCH EMPLOYEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS AND FURTHER THE INTERESTS OF THE COMPANY. Z)TO PURCHASE ACQUIRE OR UNDERTAKE ALL OR ANY OF THE PROPERTY LIABILITIES AND ENGAGEMENTS OF CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS SOCIETIES OR BODIES WITH WHICH THE COMPANY MAY CO-OPERATE OR FEDERATE. AA)TO PAY OUT OF THE FUNDS OF THE COMPANY THE COSTS OF FORMING AND REGISTERING THE COMPANY. TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS MAY BE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Mayfield House
202 Cambridge Heath Road
LONDON
E2 9LJ
- Ffôn:
- 02077902650
- E-bost:
- Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window