ORPHANS CARE FEDERATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Orphans Care Federation, A humanitarian non-governmental organization to support the humanitarian action work to provide better care for orphans and their families, OCF is a tool to connect organizations. OCF is registered in England.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Iorddonen
- Irac
- Libanus
- Twrci
Llywodraethu
- 15 Tachwedd 2018: Cofrestrwyd
- 02 Mehefin 2023: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £16.68k | £37.09k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £20.76k | £31.83k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 30 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | 30 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 01 Gorffennaf 2020 | 1 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 AUG 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 SEP 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS THAT ARE WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF ORPHANS BY: I) PROVIDING TRAINING, SERVICES AND SUPPORT; II) PROMOTING CO-OPERATION, CO-ORDINATION AND INFORMATION EXCHANGE; III) ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING INNOVATION; IV) PROVIDING REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY; V) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. B) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window