Dogfen lywodraethu TEES VALLEY WILDLIFE TRUST LTD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/08/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN THE TEES VALLEY AREA (1) TO CONSERVE WITHIN THE TEES VALLEY AREA AS VARIED A RANGE AS POSSIBLE OF WILDLIFE HABITATS AND SPECIES BOTH TERRESTRIAL AND MARINE AND SITES OF GEOLOGICAL INTEREST. (2) TO FOSTER IN ALL SECTIONS OF THE POPULATION AN AWARENESS OF THE NEED FOR NATURE CONSERVATION AND TO PROMOTE AN UNDERSTANDING OF ITS PRINCIPLES. (3) TO ESTABLISH, FORM, OWN, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SANCTUARIES AND RESERVES FOR THE PRESERVATION OF FAUNA AND VEGETATION AND AREAS OF BOTANICAL, BIOLOGICAL, ZOOLOGICAL, ECOLOGICAL, SYLVICULTURAL OR GEOLOGICAL INTEREST. (4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
TEES VALLEY - BOROUGHS OF HARTLEPOOL, REDCAR AND CLEVELAND, MIDDLESBROUGH, STOCKTON AND DARLINGTON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.