URSULINE PREPARATORY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Hold fundraising activities within the school grounds that also help foster the relationships between the children, parents and staff such as school discos, quiz nights, movie nights, bingo, fairs, and run a weekly french cafe and half termly second hand uniform stalls. Additionally we host a biannual charity ball for parents staff and alumni of the school.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 01 Rhagfyr 2017: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Hydref 2024: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
- UPSPA (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £66.02k | £32.42k | £19.44k | £60.11k | £54.69k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £69.72k | £50.32k | £9.91k | £43.19k | £81.28k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2023 | 05 Chwefror 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2023 | 05 Chwefror 2024 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | 02 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | 02 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | 06 Medi 2022 | 68 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 03 Medi 2022 | 430 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | 03 Medi 2022 | 430 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 03 Medi 2022 | 795 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | 03 Medi 2022 | 795 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) EXTENDING AND FOSTERING DEEPER RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE PUPILS, STAFF, PARENTS, ALUMNI AND OTHER FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL; BUILDING THE SPIRITUAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE SCHOOL COMMUNITY; AND PROVIDING A FORUM TO DISCUSS TOPICS OF GENERAL INTEREST. 2) RUNNING ACTIVITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE SCHOOL, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE SCHOOL COMMUNITY AND TO ASSIST THE SCHOOL IN WHATEVER WAY THE PARENTS, THE SCHOOL AND THE HEAD TEACHER TOGETHER DEEM APPROPRIATE. 3) FUND-RAISING ON BEHALF OF THE SCHOOL TO PROVIDE ENHANCED FACILITIES, RESOURCES, AND EQUIPMENT TO BENEFIT THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL. 4) MAKING DONATIONS OR PROVIDE GRANTS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES TO OTHER REGISTERED CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS CHOSEN FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE ASSOCIATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window