Dogfen lywodraethu THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 512334
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/10/1981 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/1981 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, PARTIALLY-SIGHTED OR THOSE WHO HAVE DIFFICULTY READING BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION, ON A REGULAR BASIS, OF AN AUDIO RECORDING OF NEWS FROM IN AND AROUND PERSHORE (AND WHERE NECESSARY PROVIDE THE MEANS OF PLAYING THE RECORDING).
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.