THE JOHN BETTS SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Charity owns the freehold of a building located at 7 Paddenswick Road London W6 0UA. It is provided to The John Betts School Foundation for the operation of a Primary School. Through its investments in property and listed investments The John Betts School Foundation provides funds for the repair and maintenance of the Fabric and the building.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Llywodraethu
- 01 Ionawr 1961: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cronfeydd arian wrth gefn
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau buddsoddi cronfeydd elusen
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
6 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Goodhew | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophy Doyle | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hammersley | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Diana Greenwood | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JONES | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael Askins | Ymddiriedolwr | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £2.47k | £53.11k | £55.04k | £113.33k | £103.21k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £239.67k | £69.93k | £67.49k | £52.03k | £80.11k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 17 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 17 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 09 Tachwedd 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 09 Tachwedd 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 03 Chwefror 2023 | 3 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 03 Chwefror 2023 | 3 diwrnod yn hwyr | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 08 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 08 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 29 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUN 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY MAINTAINING THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY (INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDINGS THEREOF) AND ALL OTHER CHARGES AND OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND ALL THE PROPER COSTS, CHARGES AND EXPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY. 4.2 SUBJECT TO OBJECT 4.1 ABOVE, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNORS TO BE APPLIED BY THEM IN DISCHARGING THEIR OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL. 4.3 SUBJECT TO OBJECTS 4.1 AND 4.2 ABOVE: 4.3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ANY SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL, AS MAY BE AGREED BETWEEN THE CHARITY AND THE GOVERNORS. 4.3.2 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- I IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL OR TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE CHARITY; II IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL OR FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 4.3.3 IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED IN ANY YEAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS QUALIFIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECT 4.3.2 ABOVE THE CHARITY MAY APPLY THE SAME IN THE MANNER SPECIFIED IN THAT OBJECT FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE OTHERWISE QUALIFIED WHO ALTHOUGH NOT PUPILS OR FORMER PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH. 4.4 IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED IN ANY YEAR IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECTS 4.1 TO 4.3 ABOVE THE CHARITY MAY INVEST OR REINVEST THE SAME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POWERS OF INVESTMENT UNDER ARTICLE 5.14, IN ORDER TO PUT THE SAME TOWARDS THE FULFILMENT OF THE OBJECTS IN FUTURE YEARS. 4.5 IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED IN ANY YEAR IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECTS 4.1 TO 4.4 ABOVE THE CHARITY MAY PAY THE SAME TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE HAMMERSMITH UNITED CHARITIES FOR APPLICATION BY THEM FOR THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ALMS-HOUSES AND THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES OF THAT CHARITY. 4.6 THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE DESIRABILITY OF CONSULTING THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS TO THEIR GENERAL ACTION UNDER OBJECTS 4.2 AND 4.3 ABOVE AND, IF OCCASION REQUIRES, AS TO THE EDUCATIONAL QUALIFICATIONS OF CANDIDATES FOR BENEFIT. 4.7 IN ALLOCATING BENEFITS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECTS 4.2 AND 4.3 ABOVE THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF A BROADLY CHRISTIAN NATURE.
Elusennau cysylltiedig
- 01 Ionawr 1961 : Cofrestrwyd
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
33 Benbow Road
London
W6 0AU
- Ffôn:
- 07768664810
- E-bost:
- sharon_robinson@btinternet.com
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window