Dogfen lywodraethu THE DONCASTER AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 06/10/1977 AND AMENDED ON 15/11/1979 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/1980 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/1992 AND BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES UNDER S74C ON 19/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/14 as amended on 15 Nov 2019 as amended on 05 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR PARTIALLY BLIND, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES OR BY OTHER ORAL MEANS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION.)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.