Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF HARTHILL AND CALDERSTONES PARK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1982 AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 1983, 14 FEBRUARY 1994,10 OCTOBER 1994 AND 9 FEBRUARY 2009.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT WITHIN THE CAPACITY OF THE FRIENDS FOR THE PARK'S PROJECTS AIMED AT CONSERVING AND ENHANCING HARTHILL AND CALDERSTONES PARK'S ENVIRONMENT AND ITS APPEAL TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY PURCHASING ITEMS FOR THE PARK. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE FRIENDS BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS AND INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO PARTICIPATE IN EDUCATIONAL MEETINGS RELATING TO FLORA AND FAUNA AND IN OTHER GROUP EVENTS.
Maes buddion
HARTHILL AND CALDERSTONES PARK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.