Dogfen lywodraethu Gateshead Youth Council
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED FEBRUARY 1980 AMENDED 9 MARCH 1982, 23 FEBRUARY 1983 , 14 MAY 1992 AND 22 MAY 1996 as amended on 09 May 2018 as amended on 09 May 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUTH ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD REGARDLESS OF THEIR RACE, RELIGION, GENDER, SEXUALITY, DISABILITY OR POLITICAL OPINION :- A) FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE; B) A FORUM FOR YOUNG PEOPLE; C) IDENTIFY AND WORK TOGETHER ON ISSUES AND NEEDS AFFECTING THE LIVES OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE ORGANISATIONS WHICH SERVE THEIR NEEDS WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD; D) PROVIDE AND RUN SPECIAL EVENTS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE; E) PROMOTE EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUTH ORGANISATIONS.
Maes buddion
GATESHEAD BOROUGH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.