Dogfen lywodraethu LIVERPOOL AND SOUTH WEST LANCASHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 512906

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/06/1982 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/1993 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2011 as amended on 16 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE PART OF LANCASHIRE KNOWN AS THE HUNDRED OF WEST DERBY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.