Dogfen lywodraethu STRUT LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/07/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/12/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO RELIEVE SUFFERING BY PROVIDING A CARING ENVIRONMENT FOR CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 19 WHO LIVE IN OR NEAR LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE. 2. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES IN THE FORM OF PARENT SUPPORT GROUPS AND SIBLING GROUPS
Maes buddion
LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.