Dogfen lywodraethu BROUGHTON AND BRETTON COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 4 DECEMBER 1984, 25 MAY 1990,16 JUNE 1995 AND 13 JUNE 1997 AND 11 JUNE 1999.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BROUGHTON AND BRETTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFRT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION.)
Maes buddion
BROUGHTON AND BRETTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.