Dogfen lywodraethu FRANCIS NEILSON TRUST FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 OCT 1949 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31 JUL 2019 as amended on 19 Sep 2019 as amended on 21 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
to pay or apply the income arising therefrom in each year for any or all of the following purposes: a) supporting and promoting the education of the Choristers of Liverpool Cathedral Choir ('Choristers') in cultural and scientific arts; b) such other benefits to or for the Choristers associated with their overall education; c) supporting the provision of special services, not being part of the ordinary or daily activity of Liverpool Cathedral; d) in otherwise promoting the continued existence of Liverpool Cathedral Choir ('the Choir') within the Cathedral including through assisting in the recruitment of Choristers and the promotion of the Choir throughout the Diocese. For the purposes of this clause a Chorister means any Chorister who is under the age of 25
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.