Dogfen lywodraethu LEYLAND PLAY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 1984, 29 JANUARY 1985 AND 13 FEBRUARY 1985 AND 19 NOVEMBER 1985
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR CHILDREN PRIMARILY IN LEYLAND AND SOUTH RIBBLE AREA BEING FACILITIES:- (A) OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANES, AND (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Maes buddion
LEYLAND AND SOUTH RIBBLE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.